U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50147-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sweeten
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 25, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 24, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 18, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 18, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 16, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 16, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 11, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 11, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 11, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 11, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 11, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 31, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 05, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 05, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 29, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 29, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 29, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 29, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 03, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 12, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 12, 2019: [Consent]
  • April 12, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 20, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 20, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 20, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 20, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 06, 2019: [Request]
  • March 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 04, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 04, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 04, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 04, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 01, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • February 08, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 08, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.