U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50145-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Huber
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • September 24, 2022: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • September 21, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 16, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 16, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 14, 2022: [Leave to]
  • September 09, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • August 15, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 11, 2022: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 02, 2022: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 02, 2022: [Statement of Factual Basis]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 15, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 04, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 07, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 30, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 06, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 23, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 20, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 17, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 10, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 12, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 24, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 07, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 07, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 07, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 07, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 07, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 07, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 07, 2018: [Arrest]
  • December 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.