U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50153-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 20, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 13, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 13, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 13, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 08, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 15, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 15, 2019: [Extend]
  • April 01, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 15, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 15, 2019: [Consent]
  • February 15, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 01, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 31, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 31, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 31, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 08, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 29, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 28, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • November 21, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • November 21, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.