U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50151-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wash et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 13, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 13, 2020: [Consent]
  • March 13, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 05, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 05, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 05, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Notice]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 15, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 12, 2019: [Request]
  • August 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 12, 2019: [Text Order]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 09, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 09, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 09, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 09, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 09, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 08, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 09, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • June 21, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 21, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Request]
  • December 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 10, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 07, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • December 07, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 07, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 07, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 07, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 07, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 07, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 06, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 04, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.