U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50146-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Weston
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • May 01, 2020: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 01, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 16, 2019: [Request]
  • January 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 16, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 16, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 15, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 14, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 14, 2019: [Arrest]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.