U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50149-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Janis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2024
  • November 07, 2024: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 20, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 20, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 20, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 20, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 20, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 19, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 17, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 08, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 02, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 19, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 19, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 28, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 21, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 18, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 18, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 06, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 30, 2019: [Extend]
  • August 16, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 11, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 11, 2019: [Consent]
  • June 11, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 10, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 10, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 10, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 25, 2019: [Request]
  • March 22, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 22, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 21, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 05, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.