U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-30023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Denoyer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 07, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 02, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 30, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 24, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 11, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • August 11, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 11, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 11, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 11, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 11, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 09, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • August 06, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 15, 2020: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • June 15, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 15, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 15, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 15, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • June 15, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 12, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 10, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 10, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 07, 2020: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • April 07, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 07, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 07, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 12, 2020: [Request]
  • March 11, 2020: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 11, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 11, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 11, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 11, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • March 11, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 11, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • March 11, 2020: [Request]
  • March 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 10, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 10, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Indictment]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • November 26, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 26, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.