U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Schauer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 02, 2019: [Sentencing]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 24, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 24, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 06, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 08, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 08, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 08, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 01, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 28, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 28, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 28, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 28, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • February 28, 2019: [Leave to]
  • February 25, 2019: [Notice]
  • February 25, 2019: [Leave to]
  • February 25, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 25, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • February 22, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • February 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • February 21, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 21, 2019: [Suppress]
  • February 15, 2019: [Consent]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 14, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 07, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 28, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 28, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 28, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 28, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 28, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 28, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 28, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 28, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 27, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 27, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 26, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.