U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cv-05085
  • Case Name: Lewison v. Rapid City Police Department et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • September 12, 2019: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 12, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 12, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 12, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Letter Sent]
  • November 29, 2018: [Request for Electronic Notice (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 29, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 29, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 29, 2018: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.