U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40134-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Response]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Reconsideration]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Response]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • March 07, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 03, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 09, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 08, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 01, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 01, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 01, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 26, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 26, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 19, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 19, 2019: [Continue]
  • July 15, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 02, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 08, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 07, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 06, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 06, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 06, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 06, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 01, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • February 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 28, 2018: [Discovery]
  • December 19, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 18, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 18, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 18, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 18, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 18, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 18, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 18, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 17, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
  • November 29, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 29, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.