U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30151-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Charger
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 01, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 01, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 15, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 15, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 15, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 08, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 18, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 15, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 03, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 03, 2018: [Consent]
  • December 03, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 03, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 03, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 03, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 03, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 30, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 30, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 30, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • November 30, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.