U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Running Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 28, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 10, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 04, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 30, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 21, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 21, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice]
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 16, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 02, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Memorandum Letter]
  • June 21, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 20, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 20, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 20, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 10, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 26, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 21, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 14, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 14, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 04, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 03, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 03, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 03, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 03, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 03, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 03, 2018: [Request]
  • December 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 03, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 03, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 03, 2018: [Arrest]
  • December 03, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 03, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.