U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bjornstad
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 02, 2019: [Sentencing]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 25, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 25, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 25, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 25, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 25, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 22, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 21, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 06, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 26, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 26, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 14, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 13, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 19, 2019: [Discovery]
  • February 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Response]
  • January 16, 2019: [Request]
  • January 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 16, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 15, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 14, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 04, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
  • December 03, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.