U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40151-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Webb et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 05, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 09, 2020: [Extend]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 13, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 11, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 11, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 11, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 04, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 16, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • September 30, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • September 16, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 09, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 09, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 03, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • August 30, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 30, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 30, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 30, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 29, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 29, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 29, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 26, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 26, 2019: [Leave to]
  • August 16, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 02, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 17, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 11, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 10, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 10, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 21, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 04, 2019: [Discovery]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • December 27, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 27, 2018: [Arrest]
  • December 27, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 27, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • December 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 20, 2018: [Discovery]
  • December 20, 2018: [Request]
  • December 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 19, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 18, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 18, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 18, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 18, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 18, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 18, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 17, 2018: [Response]
  • December 17, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 14, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 14, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 14, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 14, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 14, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 14, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 14, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 13, 2018: [Request]
  • December 13, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 13, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 13, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 04, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.