U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40148-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moreno-Perez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 11, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 11, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 11, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 07, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 31, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 10, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 09, 2019: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 13, 2018: [Discovery]
  • December 11, 2018: [Response]
  • December 10, 2018: [Request]
  • December 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 06, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 06, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 06, 2018: [Arrest]
  • December 06, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 06, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 06, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 06, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 06, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
  • December 04, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 04, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.