U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40152-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mesteth
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 02, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 01, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 01, 2019: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 21, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 21, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 03, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 12, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 12, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 10, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • April 04, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 02, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 02, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 02, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 02, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 26, 2019: [Discovery]
  • March 21, 2019: [Request]
  • March 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 20, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 20, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 14, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 14, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • January 07, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 04, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Arrest]
  • December 27, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 18, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 04, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.