U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40147-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Felix-Gonzalez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 30, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 22, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 17, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 17, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 04, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 29, 2019: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 13, 2018: [Discovery]
  • December 11, 2018: [Response]
  • December 10, 2018: [Request]
  • December 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 06, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 06, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2018: [Arrest]
  • December 06, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 06, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 06, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 06, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 06, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 06, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
  • December 04, 2018: [Indictment]
  • December 04, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.