U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40155-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones-Hegge
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • February 04, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 16, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 16, 2019: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • December 09, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 09, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 09, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 26, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 16, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 16, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 29, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 14, 2018: [Discovery]
  • December 11, 2018: [Request]
  • December 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 07, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 06, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 06, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 06, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 06, 2018: [Arrest]
  • December 06, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 06, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 04, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.