U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40153-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Olson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 21, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 21, 2019: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • October 21, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 15, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 15, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 15, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 15, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 10, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 12, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 06, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 05, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 05, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 01, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 29, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 17, 2018: [Discovery]
  • December 11, 2018: [Request]
  • December 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 07, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 06, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2018: [Arrest]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 06, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 06, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 06, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 06, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 06, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 04, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.