U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40150-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ledbetter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 14, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • February 14, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 11, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 11, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 13, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • January 06, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 06, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 06, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 11, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 17, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 17, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 17, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 26, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 11, 2019: [Discovery]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Response]
  • January 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 18, 2019: [Request]
  • January 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • January 18, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 18, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 17, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 17, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 16, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 15, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.