U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40154-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clark
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 21, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 21, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 15, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 15, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 10, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 10, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 10, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 23, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 23, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 23, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 23, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 15, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 29, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 02, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 17, 2018: [Discovery]
  • December 11, 2018: [Request]
  • December 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 07, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 06, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 06, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 06, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 06, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2018: [Arrest]
  • December 06, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 06, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 04, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.