U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40149-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Coon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • June 28, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 02, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 01, 2019: [Sentencing]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 21, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 21, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 21, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • May 30, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 29, 2019: [Furlough]
  • May 28, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 01, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 01, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 01, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 27, 2018: [Discovery]
  • December 17, 2018: [Response]
  • December 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 17, 2018: [Arrest]
  • December 13, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 12, 2018: [Request]
  • December 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 12, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 11, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 11, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 11, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 11, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 04, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.