U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40132-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jobin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Response]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • April 25, 2025: [Reduce Sentence (Part A & B Criminal History Amendment)]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • June 16, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 14, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • September 10, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 08, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 08, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 04, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 04, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 13, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 24, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 23, 2020: [Consent]
  • June 17, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 17, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 17, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • May 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 05, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 06, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • February 05, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 05, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 04, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 04, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 05, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 09, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 07, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 07, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 07, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 07, 2019: [Request]
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 11, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • February 08, 2019: [Bail Report]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 02, 2019: [Continue]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 04, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 04, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 04, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.