U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40146-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dykshorn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 08, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 07, 2019: [Sentencing]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 24, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 24, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 24, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 16, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 08, 2019: [Special Notice of Appearance - Supervising Attorney and Law Student]
  • July 03, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 02, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 02, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 02, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 29, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 14, 2018: [Discovery]
  • December 12, 2018: [Response]
  • December 12, 2018: [Request]
  • December 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 07, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 06, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 06, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 06, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 06, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 06, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 06, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 06, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.