U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Skrehot
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 01, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • August 18, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • February 11, 2021: [Response]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 09, 2021: [Extend]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • January 26, 2021: [Supplement]
  • January 26, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • January 21, 2021: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 12, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Admission]
  • January 11, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • January 11, 2021: [Admission]
  • January 11, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 05, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 12, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 11, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 05, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 05, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 05, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 26, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 29, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 16, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 06, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 06, 2019: [Consent]
  • June 06, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 30, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 30, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 30, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 09, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 22, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 18, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 18, 2019: [Notice]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 18, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 18, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 17, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 07, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 07, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.