U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30152-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ortiz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Return of Property]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Response to Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [Return of Property]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Request]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 31, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 23, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 18, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 01, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 18, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 18, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 03, 2019: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 03, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 03, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 29, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 29, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 23, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 07, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • December 11, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 11, 2018: [Arrest]
  • December 07, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • December 07, 2018: [Request]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 07, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 07, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 07, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 07, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 07, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 07, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.