U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50155-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Torrez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 31, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 28, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 24, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 24, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 22, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • January 22, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 22, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 22, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 08, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 06, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Extend]
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 14, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 14, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 12, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 25, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 25, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 25, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 25, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 23, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 18, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 06, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 06, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 06, 2019: [Consent]
  • September 06, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 06, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 28, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 28, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 28, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 06, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 19, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 19, 2019: [Consent]
  • July 19, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 12, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 01, 2019: [Continue]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 28, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 28, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 28, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 27, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 27, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 13, 2019: [Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 26, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 17, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • April 17, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 05, 2019: [Response to Motion]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 29, 2019: [Extend]
  • January 28, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 28, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 09, 2019: [Extend]
  • January 08, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 04, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 03, 2019: [Notice]
  • January 03, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 03, 2019: [Suppress]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Disclosure ]
  • December 14, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 13, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 13, 2018: [Request]
  • December 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 12, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 12, 2018: [Consent]
  • December 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 12, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 12, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 12, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 12, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 11, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 11, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 10, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 10, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.