U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30164-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burgee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Receipt]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [USCA Order]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [USCA Opinion]
  • February 24, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Order Modifying Supervised Release]
  • July 22, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • October 11, 2019: [Transcript]
  • October 11, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • September 23, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • September 17, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 17, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 10, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 09, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 09, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 05, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 05, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 05, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 05, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 22, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [Findings of Fact]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Court Trial Held (One Day Trial)]
  • June 18, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • June 14, 2019: [Trial Brief ]
  • June 14, 2019: [Witness List]
  • June 14, 2019: [Exhibit List]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2019: [Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Waiver]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • March 25, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 06, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 01, 2019: [Response to Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 15, 2019: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 08, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 08, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 04, 2019: [Furlough]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Arrest]
  • January 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 31, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • December 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 28, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 28, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 28, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 28, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 28, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 28, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 28, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • December 28, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 27, 2018: [Request]
  • December 27, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 19, 2018: [Request]
  • December 17, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 11, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.