U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30162-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burgee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • December 05, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 04, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • December 04, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 04, 2019: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 12, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 08, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 08, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 08, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Sealed Response to Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 15, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 09, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 26, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 26, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 23, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 23, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 23, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • August 20, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • August 20, 2019: [Jury List]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Brief]
  • June 20, 2019: [Notice]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 17, 2019: [Consent]
  • June 17, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 14, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 16, 2019: [Consent]
  • April 16, 2019: [Continue]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 13, 2019: [Consent]
  • February 13, 2019: [Continue]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 03, 2019: [Notice]
  • January 03, 2019: [Request]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • January 02, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 31, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 31, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 31, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 31, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 31, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 31, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 31, 2018: [Arrest]
  • December 31, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • December 31, 2018: [Request]
  • December 31, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 31, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 31, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 31, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 11, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.