U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30158-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nixon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 07, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 04, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 17, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 29, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • September 06, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 02, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 02, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 01, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 23, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 19, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 18, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 18, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 09, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 09, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • July 09, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 09, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 09, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 09, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 06, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 14, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 29, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 18, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 18, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 20, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 25, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 25, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 15, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 14, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 14, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 07, 2019: [Request]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 28, 2018: [Request]
  • December 28, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 27, 2018: [Arrest]
  • December 27, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 21, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 21, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 21, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 21, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 11, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.