U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30161-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Neck
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 05, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 05, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 05, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 05, 2019: [Exhibit List]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 31, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 29, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 29, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 28, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 23, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 14, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 14, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 14, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • December 21, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • December 19, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 19, 2018: [Request]
  • December 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 14, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 14, 2018: [Request]
  • December 14, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 13, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 13, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 13, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 13, 2018: [Arrest]
  • December 13, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 13, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 13, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 11, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.