U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:11-cr-10024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Larrabee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 23, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 28, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 21, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 14, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • May 13, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 07, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 07, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 11, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.