U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30163-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yellow Eyes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 14, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • May 26, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 26, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 26, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 26, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 26, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • April 12, 2021: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 09, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 09, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 09, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 07, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 06, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 29, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 25, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 19, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2019: [Furlough]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 19, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 06, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 06, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 06, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 17, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 17, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 05, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 20, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • January 15, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 04, 2019: [Request]
  • January 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 04, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 04, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • January 04, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 03, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • January 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 03, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 02, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 02, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 02, 2019: [Request]
  • January 02, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 02, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 11, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 11, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.