U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30160-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Provancial
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 12, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 12, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 11, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 03, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Extend]
  • July 20, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 07, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • March 19, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Oral Motion to Continue Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 24, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Continue Detention Hearing]
  • November 24, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 24, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 23, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 23, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 23, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 23, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • November 20, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 28, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 17, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 17, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 15, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 17, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 25, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 25, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 25, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 18, 2018: [Request]
  • December 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 14, 2018: [Request]
  • December 14, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 14, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 14, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 14, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 14, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 14, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 14, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 14, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 14, 2018: [Arrest]
  • December 13, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 13, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 13, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 11, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.