U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30157-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rademacher
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • January 20, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • August 14, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 12, 2020: [Forfeiture]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 13, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • March 13, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 30, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 22, 2019: [Extend]
  • July 22, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 22, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 19, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 19, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 19, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 09, 2019: [Extend]
  • July 09, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • June 25, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 24, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 21, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 20, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 10, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 09, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 09, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 03, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 03, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 03, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Extend]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 18, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • February 04, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 30, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 30, 2019: [Request]
  • January 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 29, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 29, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 29, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 29, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 29, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 29, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 29, 2019: [Arrest]
  • January 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 28, 2019: [Request]
  • January 28, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 28, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.