U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30159-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flute
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 07, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 07, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • October 06, 2022: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • October 05, 2022: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • October 05, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 05, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 05, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 21, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • September 20, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • September 20, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 20, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 19, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 25, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 19, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 18, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 18, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 07, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 07, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 07, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 06, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 06, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 06, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 15, 2021: [Consent]
  • July 15, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 15, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 15, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 15, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 15, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 15, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 09, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 06, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 25, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 25, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 30, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 26, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 15, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 17, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 17, 2020: [Request]
  • December 17, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 16, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 16, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing (FOR COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 16, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • December 16, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 16, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • December 16, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 16, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 16, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 16, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 16, 2020: [Request]
  • December 15, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • December 11, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 11, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2020: [Indictment]
  • December 04, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 03, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 02, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • December 02, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 02, 2020: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 02, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 02, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 01, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 15, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 10, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 05, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 05, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 05, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2019: [Allocution Statement]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 15, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 07, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 30, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 30, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • January 02, 2019: [Stipulation]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 20, 2018: [Request]
  • December 17, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 14, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 14, 2018: [Request]
  • December 14, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 13, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 13, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 13, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 13, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 13, 2018: [Arrest]
  • December 13, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 13, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 13, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 11, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.