U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Noisy Hawk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 02, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 01, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 25, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 25, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 11, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 25, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 25, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 23, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 15, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 15, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 15, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 10, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 14, 2018: [Request]
  • December 14, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 13, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 12, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 12, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 12, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 12, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 12, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 12, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 12, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.