U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40157-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hoshaw et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • March 11, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • December 30, 2019: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
  • December 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 03, 2019: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • December 03, 2019: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Passport - Return of]
  • November 21, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 18, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • November 05, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 04, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 04, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 04, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 15, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 16, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 16, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 01, 2019: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 14, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 13, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 13, 2019: [Discovery]
  • February 13, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 12, 2019: [Discovery]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 28, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 28, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 28, 2019: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • January 28, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 28, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 28, 2019: [Bail Report]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 18, 2018: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 13, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 13, 2018: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • December 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 12, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • December 12, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 12, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 12, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 12, 2018: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.