U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40133-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodgers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 15, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • October 13, 2020: [Supplement]
  • October 13, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 29, 2020: [Extend]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 18, 2020: [Extend]
  • September 17, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • September 17, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 22, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 22, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 22, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 19, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 19, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 09, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 03, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 03, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • July 03, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 08, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 06, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 06, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 06, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 06, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 18, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 18, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • April 17, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 16, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 28, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 27, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 26, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 08, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 08, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • February 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 07, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 07, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 07, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 06, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 06, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
  • December 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 17, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.