U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50165-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Iron Thunder
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • October 04, 2022: [Dismiss Amended Petition to Revoke]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 10, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 09, 2022: [Revoke]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 01, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Transcript]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • January 03, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 03, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 22, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 20, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • November 16, 2020: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • June 17, 2020: [Release from Custody]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • April 22, 2020: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 22, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 14, 2020: [Continue]
  • April 09, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 02, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 01, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • April 01, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • April 01, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 01, 2019: [Sentencing]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 25, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 25, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 24, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 21, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 13, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 29, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 29, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 11, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 11, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 11, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 08, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2018: [Request]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 21, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2018: [Arrest]
  • December 20, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 18, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.