U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30165-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Iron Shell et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 21, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 21, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 18, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • December 18, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 15, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 15, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 15, 2020: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • December 14, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 10, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 09, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 09, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 08, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 08, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 08, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • December 08, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 08, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 07, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 07, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
November, 2020
  • November 27, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 24, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 24, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 12, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 09, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 09, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Unexecuted]
  • October 06, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 06, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 06, 2020: [Consent]
  • October 06, 2020: [Information - Felony]
  • October 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 05, 2020: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 05, 2020: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 05, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • September 30, 2020: [Extend]
  • September 29, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 28, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 21, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 17, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 17, 2020: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 17, 2020: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 17, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 03, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 29, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 27, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 27, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • July 21, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 21, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 21, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • July 16, 2020: [Indictment - Superseding]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Order]
  • June 12, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 11, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 11, 2020: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • June 11, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 03, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 02, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 01, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • May 27, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 27, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Furlough]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 03, 2020: [Furlough]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • January 30, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 30, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • January 09, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 08, 2020: [Release from Custody]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 20, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 26, 2019: [Furlough]
  • November 20, 2019: [Furlough]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • November 18, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • November 15, 2019: [Furlough]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 07, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 05, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 05, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 20, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • September 20, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 10, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • September 05, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 15, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 11, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 18, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 07, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 06, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 09, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Consent]
  • April 30, 2019: [Continue]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 25, 2019: [Consent]
  • February 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 08, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 28, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • January 25, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 18, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 17, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • January 15, 2019: [Arrest]
  • January 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 14, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • January 14, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 11, 2019: [Request]
  • January 11, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 11, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 11, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 10, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 10, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 09, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 08, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 07, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 07, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 07, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 07, 2019: [Arrest]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 07, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 07, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 07, 2019: [Request]
  • January 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 07, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 07, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.