U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50163-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morales-Aguilar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 19, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 19, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 04, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 18, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 18, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 18, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 14, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 11, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 09, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 09, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 09, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 03, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • December 18, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • December 18, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.