U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50164-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Oviedo-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 16, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 08, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • May 05, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 05, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 05, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 25, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 08, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 08, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 08, 2019: [Consent]
  • February 08, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 08, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 06, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 05, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 23, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 23, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 23, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 28, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • December 18, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
  • December 18, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.