U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50161-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bad Milk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 18, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 17, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 06, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 06, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 06, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 06, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 08, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 01, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 01, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 22, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • April 22, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 16, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 03, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 07, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 07, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • February 07, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 07, 2020: [Consent]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 30, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 29, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 29, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 29, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 27, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 27, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 09, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 07, 2019: [Compel ]
  • May 06, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • May 02, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 03, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 02, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Request]
  • December 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 21, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 21, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2018: [Arrest]
  • December 18, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.