U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50166-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Two Bulls
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • November 07, 2019: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • November 01, 2019: [Dismiss Count]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 16, 2019: [Dismiss Count]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • April 18, 2019: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • April 17, 2019: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • April 09, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 05, 2019: [Transcript]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • March 15, 2019: [Verdict]
  • March 15, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • March 15, 2019: [Response to Jury Question]
  • March 15, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • March 15, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 15, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • March 13, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • March 13, 2019: [Jury List]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 13, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • March 12, 2019: [Supplement]
  • March 11, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • March 11, 2019: [Notice]
  • March 11, 2019: [Response]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Transport Defendant]
  • March 09, 2019: [In Limine]
  • March 08, 2019: [Response]
  • March 08, 2019: [Witness List]
  • March 07, 2019: [Response]
  • March 07, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 07, 2019: [Trial Brief ]
  • March 07, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • March 06, 2019: [Witness List]
  • March 06, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 06, 2019: [Transport Defendant]
  • March 06, 2019: [Notice]
  • March 05, 2019: [In Limine]
  • March 04, 2019: [Notice]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • January 25, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • January 24, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • January 23, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 23, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 16, 2019: [Certificate]
  • January 16, 2019: [Compel ]
  • January 07, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 07, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • January 07, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 07, 2019: [Request]
  • January 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 04, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 04, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 04, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 03, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order of Recusal]
  • January 02, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 02, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 19, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.