U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50162-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roque-Carias
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 02, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 01, 2020: [Sentencing]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 05, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 05, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 05, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 27, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • April 27, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 02, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 31, 2020: [Consent]
  • January 31, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 31, 2020: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • January 28, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 21, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 16, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 16, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 16, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: [Notice]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 23, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 09, 2019: [Request]
  • October 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 09, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 07, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 04, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 04, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 04, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 04, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 04, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • October 04, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 04, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 04, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
  • December 19, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.