U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30153-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ducheneaux
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • September 20, 2022: [Forfeiture]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Declaration of Publication]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 29, 2022: [Forfeiture]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • December 14, 2021: [USCA Opinion]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • March 10, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • March 09, 2021: [Transcript]
  • March 05, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
  • March 05, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 16, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • February 12, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • February 12, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 02, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 02, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 01, 2021: [Sentencing]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 19, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 19, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 12, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 12, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 11, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 11, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 05, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 17, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 08, 2020: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • December 08, 2020: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • November 13, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • November 13, 2020: [Order re Exhibits]
  • November 13, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • November 13, 2020: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • November 13, 2020: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • November 13, 2020: [Verdict]
  • November 13, 2020: [Response to Jury Question]
  • November 13, 2020: [Jury Question]
  • November 13, 2020: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 13, 2020: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 10, 2020: [Jury List]
  • November 09, 2020: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2020: [Witness List]
  • November 09, 2020: [Exhibit List (attorney use)]
  • November 06, 2020: [Exhibit List (attorney use)]
  • November 06, 2020: [Witness List]
  • November 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • November 04, 2020: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • November 03, 2020: [Jury List]
  • November 03, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • November 02, 2020: [Witness List]
  • November 02, 2020: [Exhibit List (attorney use)]
  • November 02, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • November 02, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • November 02, 2020: [In Limine]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 09, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • October 07, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 08, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 01, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 12, 2020: [Consent]
  • June 12, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 23, 2020: [Consent]
  • March 17, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 16, 2020: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • January 15, 2020: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • January 15, 2020: [Consent]
  • January 15, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • December 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Certificate]
  • November 27, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 27, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 27, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2019: [Consent]
  • October 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 10, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 10, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • October 09, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 09, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 09, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Request]
  • September 19, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 19, 2019: [Discovery]
  • September 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 01, 2019: [Furlough]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 22, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 21, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 18, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 18, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • July 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 12, 2019: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • July 09, 2019: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 11, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 11, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 11, 2019: [Notice]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 06, 2019: [Extend]
  • June 06, 2019: [Suppress]
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 02, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 02, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Order]
  • March 06, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 27, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 14, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 14, 2019: [Arraignment]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • January 23, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • January 22, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • January 17, 2019: [Request]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 07, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 04, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • January 04, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • January 02, 2019: [Bail Report]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Request]
  • December 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 21, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 21, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 20, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 20, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 20, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 19, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 19, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 19, 2018: [Arrest]
  • December 19, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 18, 2018: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.