U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50159-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Good Voice Elk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 04, 2021: [Sentencing]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • July 26, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 26, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 26, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 10, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • April 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2021: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • April 01, 2021: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • April 01, 2021: [Verdict]
  • April 01, 2021: [Jury Question]
  • April 01, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • April 01, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • April 01, 2021: [Jury Instructions]
  • April 01, 2021: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • March 31, 2021: [Jury List]
  • March 31, 2021: [Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • March 31, 2021: [Jury Instructions]
  • March 30, 2021: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • March 30, 2021: [Sealed Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [Response]
  • March 26, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 26, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 26, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 25, 2021: [Objection]
  • March 24, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order]
  • March 16, 2021: [Request]
  • March 08, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 08, 2021: [Objection]
  • March 04, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • March 02, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Response]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 19, 2021: [Extend]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 15, 2020: [Extend]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 13, 2020: [Extend]
  • November 09, 2020: [Objection]
  • November 09, 2020: [Brief]
  • November 09, 2020: [Notice]
  • November 09, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 08, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 07, 2020: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 02, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 02, 2020: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • July 01, 2020: [Notice of Expert Witness]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 20, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 24, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 16, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • December 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 13, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 13, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 10, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 04, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 17, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • January 24, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • January 24, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • January 18, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 14, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 02, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Request]
  • December 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 21, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 21, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 19, 2018: [Arrest]
  • December 19, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • December 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • December 19, 2018: [Seal Case]
  • December 19, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.