U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50157-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ronning
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 16, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 08, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 17, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 17, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 14, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 14, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 14, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 04, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 06, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 06, 2019: [Consent]
  • December 06, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 06, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 04, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 22, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 22, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 16, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 03, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Request]
  • December 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 21, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 21, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 21, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 20, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.