U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50160-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wallach
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 26, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • May 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 24, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 19, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 19, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 19, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 08, 2021: [Continue]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 11, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 13, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 13, 2020: [Continue]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 02, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Request]
  • September 25, 2020: [Notice]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 13, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 07, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 07, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 07, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 06, 2020: [Continue]
  • May 06, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 24, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 24, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 24, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [In Limine]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 24, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 22, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 01, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 03, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 02, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 21, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 21, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2018: [Arrest]
  • December 20, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.